MD SB484 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education to develop and operate a specified Web site that includes specified information about specified payments; specifying the parameters of the Web site; requiring the Board to post the required payment data in a timely manner; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County Public Schools Funding Accountability and Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {284035/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Disclosure
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Fees
Procurement
Public Information
Disclosure
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Fees
Procurement
Public Information