MD SB471 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-20 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-20 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the due date to December 31, 2021, by which the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties is required to submit a report on certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly; and extending the termination date for the Task Force to June 30, 2022.
Title
Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB763 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Sunset
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |