MD SB469 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Solar Incentives to study the types and impact of solar energy incentives and make recommendations regarding measures and incentives needed to ensure that the State meets the solar energy goals established in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard, minority business participation, the creation of good quality jobs, equitable access to renewable energy, and efficient use of land; and requiring the Task Force to submit its report to the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2023.
Title
Task Force to Study Solar Incentives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-17) |
2023-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {583122/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-18 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {963129/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443020/1 Adopted |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443020/1 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Counties
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Farmland
Forests and Parks
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Rural Areas
Solar Energy
studies
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Counties
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Farmland
Forests and Parks
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Rural Areas
Solar Energy
studies
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Miscellaneous