MD SB467 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Mel Noland Fellowship Program in the Department of Natural Resources to support students seeking careers in fields related to natural resources; requiring the Department and its managing organization each year to select one fellow in the field of natural resources management and one in the field of urban and community forestry; requiring that each fellow receive a $20,000 stipend; renaming a certain fund to be the Mel Noland Woodland Incentives and Fellowship Fund; etc.
Title
Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {180218/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204536/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Apprentices
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Colleges
Community Development
Curriculum
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Foresters
Forests and Parks
Governor
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Jurisdiction
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Urban Renewal
Water
Work, Labor and Employment
Alternative Energy Sources
Apprentices
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Colleges
Community Development
Curriculum
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Foresters
Forests and Parks
Governor
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Jurisdiction
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Urban Renewal
Water
Work, Labor and Employment