MD SB466 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a requirement that assent be given for the voluntary admission of a minor to certain facilities by providing that assent may be given by a physician and a licensed certified social worker-clinical or by a physician and a licensed clinical professional counselor; altering the requirement that a certificate for involuntary admission must be based on the personal examination of a physician and a licensed certified social worker-clinical or by a physician and a licensed clinical professional counselor; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health - Assent to and Certificates for Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical and Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-03-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {637670/1 Adopted
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2021-01-24SenateHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB689 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General10610(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General10615(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General10616(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General10619(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback