MD SB464 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Transportation, to submit to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee and the House Appropriations Committee by January 1, 2020, a report outlining a certain plan and identifying certain information.
Title
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-11) (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-11) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m. |
2018-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {397271/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Disclosure
Human Services, Department of
Public Employees
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Disclosure
Human Services, Department of
Public Employees
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment