MD SB460 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the Health Education Unit in the Office of the Attorney General is the State's office of consumer assistance under a certain federal law; establishing the Consumer Health Access Program for Mental Health and Addiction Care to assist State residents in accessing mental health and substance use disorder services under public and private health insurance and address insurance-related barriers to mental health and substance use disorder services; etc.
Title
Health - Insurance Coverage Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m. |
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543322/1 Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB517 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-08 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appeals
Appropriations
Boundaries
Claims
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Data
Demographics
Disabilities
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education
Emergencies
Ethics
Examinations
Gender
Governor
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hearings
Insurance Administration
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Language
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Patients
Poverty
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Sexual Orientation
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appeals
Appropriations
Boundaries
Claims
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Data
Demographics
Disabilities
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education
Emergencies
Ethics
Examinations
Gender
Governor
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hearings
Insurance Administration
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Language
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Patients
Poverty
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Sexual Orientation
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 4A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |