MD SB460 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering references to the term "clean energy" to be "advanced clean energy" for purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the Maryland Clean Energy Center and the Maryland Energy Innovation Institute; altering certain findings of the General Assembly, the purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the development of clean energy industries in the State, and the purposes, powers, and duties of the Center and Institute to include certain actions supporting clean energy innovation; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-40) |
2021-04-12 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (98-37) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-04-10 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {937874/1 (Finance Committee) Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {937874/1 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB419 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fuel
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Solar Energy
Wind Energy
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fuel
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Solar Energy
Wind Energy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 820 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 821.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 823 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 826 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 828 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 829 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 834 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 835 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 839 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 9 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |