MD SB458 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a federal home loan bank may not be stayed or prohibited from exercising certain rights with respect to certain collateral of a certain insurer-member after the 14th day following the filing of a delinquency proceeding; requiring a federal home loan bank to repurchase certain outstanding capital stock of a certain insurer-member under certain circumstances; requiring a federal home loan bank to establish a certain timeline and process within 10 business days after a request from a receiver; etc.
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 766 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB504 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 765
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Contracts
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Investments
Loans
Contracts
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Investments
Loans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 9 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |