MD SB447 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB640
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "certified historic structure" and "single-family, owner-occupied residence" to include a certain structure that is located on property that is owned by the Department of Natural Resources or one of its units and occupied by a person under an agreement with the Department by which the person pays for rehabilitation of the structure as a condition of occupancy; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Certified Historic Structure and Single–Family, Owner–Occupied Residence – Definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reassigned to Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB539 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
HB640 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Referred Budget and Taxation
HB640 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5A | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |