MD HB640 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "certified historic structure" and "single-family, owner-occupied residence" to include a structure that is located on property that is owned by the Department of Natural Resources or one of its units and occupied by a person under an agreement with the Department by which the person pays for rehabilitation of the structure as a condition of occupancy; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Certified Historic Structure and Single–Family, Owner–Occupied Residence – Definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2020-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {145268/1 Adopted |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB640 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Boundaries
Certifications
Community Development
Construction
Contracts
Historical Matters
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Publications
Real Property
Records
Residential Property
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Certifications
Community Development
Construction
Contracts
Historical Matters
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Publications
Real Property
Records
Residential Property
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5A | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |