MD SB442 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Aquaculture Coordinating Council, in consultation with the Department of the Environment, to review the policies of the Department regarding the application of State or tidal wetlands license and permit requirements to aquaculture operations in the State, and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, on the Council's recommendations, including any proposed legislation on changes needed to eliminate redundancies and conflicts in the oversight of aquaculture operations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-07SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {460713/1 Adopted
2021-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-05HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-03-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {484139/1 Adopted
2021-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-22SenateHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB799 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment16101(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment16104(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment16202(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment16304(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources411A-09(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources411A-10(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources411A-23(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback