MD HB799 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Aquaculture Coordinating Council, in coordination with the Department of the Environment, to review policies regarding the application of State or tidal wetlands license and permit requirements to aquaculture operations; and requiring, by December 1, 2021, the Council and the Department to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly their findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, or changes necessary to eliminate conflicts or redundancies in the oversight of aquaculture operations in the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-07SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-05SenateReferred Rules
2021-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2021-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {260312/1 Adopted
2021-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-02HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB442 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment16101(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment16104(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment16202(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment16304(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources411A-09(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources411A-10(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources411A-23(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback