MD SB441 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "health care provider" for the purposes of provisions of law governing the confidentiality of medical records to include comprehensive crisis response centers, crisis stabilization centers, and crisis treatment centers; providing that the list of emergency facilities the Maryland Department of Health is required to publish may include comprehensive crisis response centers, crisis stabilization centers, crisis treatment centers, and outpatient mental health clinics; etc.
Title
Mental Health – Confidentiality of Medical Records and Emergency Facilities List
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 173 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (134-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {166585/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {857374/1 Adopted |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB332 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 172
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Communications
Disclosure
Emergencies
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Communications
Disclosure
Emergencies
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 621 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |