MD HB332 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 172
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 172
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "health care provider" for the purposes of provisions of law governing the confidentiality of medical records to include comprehensive crisis response centers, crisis stabilization centers, and crisis treatment centers; providing that the list of emergency facilities the Maryland Department of Health is required to publish may include comprehensive crisis response centers, crisis stabilization centers, crisis treatment centers, and outpatient mental health clinics; etc.
Title
Mental Health – Confidentiality of Medical Records and Emergency Facilities List
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 172 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {326480/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB441 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 173
Subjects
Emergencies
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 621 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 4 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |