MD SB436 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the prior approval rate making process specified kinds of insurance and specified types of insurance coverage.
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - Exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Flood Control
Forms
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Prices
Taxicabs
Trucks
Workers' Compensation
Flood Control
Forms
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Prices
Taxicabs
Trucks
Workers' Compensation