MD SB429 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding eligibility for a credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax for certain veterans to include a surviving spouse, who has not remarried, of certain veterans; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit – Surviving Spouse of Veteran

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310
2018-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-03-30HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2018-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments {745567/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-20HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2018-03-01SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-02-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {789534/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-02-14SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0429&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0429f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0429t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0429e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_310_sb0429e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0429_78953401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0429_74556701.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0016.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0429.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0429_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0365.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0429_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0956.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1029.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback