MD SB426 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the City of Annapolis to participate in the Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact, the purpose of which is to provide for mutual assistance between the jurisdictions in managing an emergency.
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Annapolis
Communications
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Engineers
Fire Protection
Health
Inspections
Law Enforcement
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Works
Rescue Squads
Transportation
Communications
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Engineers
Fire Protection
Health
Inspections
Law Enforcement
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Works
Rescue Squads
Transportation