MD SB423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the General Assembly to provide by suitable enactment a process to allow a qualified individual to register and vote at a polling place on election day or on a day designated for voting before election day; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Title
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-49) (Y: 88 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {113829/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-82) (Y: 50 N: 82 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {113829/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-82) (Y: 50 N: 82 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (88-49) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {113829/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-82) |
2017-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {703329/1 (Delegate A. Washington) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {705366/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-13) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |