MD SB421 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain requirements for each teleworking program, policy, and guideline adopted by a certain appropriate official in State government; authorizing certain State employees to initiate a certain grievance; and requiring the University System of Maryland to include in a consolidated memorandum of understanding certain terms relating to teleworking.
Title
State Personnel - Teleworking Programs, Policies, and Guidelines - Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB528 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0421?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0421f.pdf |