MD SB420 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of expenses, as specified; requiring the Commission to review, assess, and examine matters and make findings and recommendations concerning procurements by State gaming facility licensees, as specified; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2018-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {759234/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-02-14SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback