MD SB41 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the items of information that a consumer reporting agency is prohibited from including in a consumer credit report.
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Information in Consumer Credit Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-36) |
2024-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB262 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Credit
Insurance
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Credit
Insurance
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 14 | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |