MD SB406 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county to establish a local youth violence review committee to prevent violence and homicides involving youth assailants and youth victims by promoting cooperation among certain agencies, providing youth services, determining the causes of youth violence, and recommending certain changes; specifying that certain officials may organize a local youth violence review committee; providing the committee with access to certain information; providing that certain records obtained by the committee are confidential; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB93 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-18 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Evidence
Homicide
Injury
Juvenile Causes
meetings
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Testimony
Violence
Youth
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Evidence
Homicide
Injury
Juvenile Causes
meetings
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Testimony
Violence
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0406?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0406f.pdf |