MD SB402 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Kent County Board of Education to include a student member; and providing for the initial term of the student member of the county board.
Title
Kent County - Board of Education - Student Member
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-7) |
2023-04-04 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {983429/1 Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB402 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Subjects
Communications
County Administrators
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Forms
Kent County
Public Schools
Residency
Secondary Schools
Students
Time
Voting
County Administrators
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Forms
Kent County
Public Schools
Residency
Secondary Schools
Students
Time
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |