MD HB402 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Kent County Board of Education to include a student member; providing for the initial term of the student member of the county board; requiring the student member to attend the Maryland Association of Boards of Education new student board orientation and all regular meetings of the county board; prohibiting the student member's attendance at an executive session of the county board; etc.
Title
Kent County - Board of Education - Student Member
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675 |
2023-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-14) |
2023-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {113921/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-12) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733525/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB402 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Subjects
Communications
County Administrators
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Forms
Kent County
Public Schools
Residency
Secondary Schools
Students
Time
Voting
County Administrators
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Forms
Kent County
Public Schools
Residency
Secondary Schools
Students
Time
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |