MD SB401 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the application of and altering security requirements for tow trucks; altering penalties for specified violations related to tow truck vehicle registration; repealing a provision exempting abandoned vehicles from the application of provisions relating to the towing and removal of vehicles from parking lots; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to establish and maintain a database containing addresses for specified insurers and make the database available to any tower free of charge; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Practices and Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (122-13) | |
2012-04-06 | Conference Committee Report 503823/1 | |
2012-04-04 | Delegates Niemann, Malone, and McMillan | |
2012-04-04 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-04 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-3) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments 230010/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-22 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-04-06 | Conference Committee Report 503823/1 Adopted | |
2012-04-01 | Senators Raskin, Getty, and Brochin | |
2012-04-01 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-01 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2012-04-01 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 668379/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abandoned Vehicles
Auctions
Checks
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Liability
License Plates
Licenses
Liens
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Security Interests
Signs and Billboards
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Titles
Towing
Trucks
Wreckers and Scrap Processors
Auctions
Checks
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Liability
License Plates
Licenses
Liens
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Security Interests
Signs and Billboards
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Titles
Towing
Trucks
Wreckers and Scrap Processors