MD SB400 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring incarcerated individuals to be counted in population counts in a specified manner if the individuals were residents of the State before incarceration; and prohibiting incarcerated individuals from being included in the population counts used after each decennial census for the purpose of creating a specified congressional districting plan and the legislative districting plan for the General Assembly and the legislative districts that are used to elect the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation.
Title
No Representation Without Population Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. David Harrington [D] |
Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (101-35) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (34-10) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Laid Over (Senator Stoltzfus) Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |