MD SB40 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB109
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to consider systemic renovation projects with a construction cost of at least $100,000 as eligible for funding from the Supplemental Public School Construction Financing Fund and the Supplemental Public School Construction Facilities Fund.
Title
Interagency Commission on School Construction – Systemic Renovation Projects – Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443923/1 Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB40 (Carry Over) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
HB68 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-22 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
HB68 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-22 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 650 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |