MD HB68 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-22 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-22 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to consider systemic renovation projects, regardless of cost, as eligible for funding from the Supplemental Public School Construction Financing Fund and the Supplemental Public School Construction Facilities Fund.
Title
Interagency Commission on School Construction – Systemic Renovation Projects – Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-22 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2021-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB68 (Carry Over) 2022-01-22 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
SB40 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
SB40 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 650 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0068?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0068f.pdf |