MD SB399 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the applicability of specified provisions of law relating to the Motor Vehicle Administration's collection and forwarding of Selective Service registration information to women and minors between the ages of 17 and 25 years; altering the conditions under which specified information about an applicant is forwarded to the Selective Service System; repealing specified provisions relating to federal funds for the collection and electronic forwarding of Selective Service registration information; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-4) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-4) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {828471/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Forms
Identification
Legislative Services, Department of
Minors
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Women
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Forms
Identification
Legislative Services, Department of
Minors
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Women