MD SB390 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a candidate who is defeated for the nomination for a public office from filing a certificate of candidacy as a write-in candidate at the next succeeding general election as a candidate for any office.
Title
Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 552 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-7) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-6) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1158 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 10 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 5 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 5 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |