MD HB1158 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a candidate who is defeated for the nomination for a public office from filing a certificate of candidacy as a write-in candidate at the next succeeding general election as a candidate for any office.
Title
Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-13) |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB390 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 552
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 10 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 5 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 5 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |