MD SB389 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing provisions of law relating to the Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact; repealing the State's agreement to enter into the compact; repealing the statutory provisions reciting the compact; repealing provisions relating to the appointment, terms, and removal of members of the Maryland delegation to the Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact Commission; repealing the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture to obtain certain information in a certain manner to be used by certain persons; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-02-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-02-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-13SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-12SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-06SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback