MD SB387 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Garrett County Board of Education to negotiate with an employee organization a reasonable service fee to be charged to nonmember noncertificated employees for representing the employees; prohibiting specified nonmember noncertificated employees from being charged a service fee; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Noncertificated Public School Employees - Service Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (116-24) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (43-3) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-02-16 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Education, Boards of
Fees
Garrett County
Public Employees
Public Schools
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Fees
Garrett County
Public Employees
Public Schools
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment