MD SB383 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the applicability in Caroline County of specified provisions governing the appointment and duties of members of fire companies as deputy sheriffs; and providing for the appointment and duties of members of fire companies as deputy sheriffs in Talbot County.
Title
Public Safety - Appointment of Members of Fire Companies as Deputy Sheriffs - Caroline County and Talbot County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |