MD SB382 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a petition for emergency evaluation of a specified individual include, under specified circumstances, a statement of whether the individual has possession of or access to firearms; authorizing a court, under specified circumstances, to order an emergency evaluee to surrender specified firearms to a specified peace officer; and requiring a peace officer, under specified circumstances, to take specified firearms.
Title
Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Counselors
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Disclosure
Emergencies
Guns
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Mental Health
Nurses
Patients
Petitions
Physicians
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Health
Public Safety
Search and Seizure
Social Workers
Weapons
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Disclosure
Emergencies
Guns
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Mental Health
Nurses
Patients
Petitions
Physicians
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Health
Public Safety
Search and Seizure
Social Workers
Weapons