MD SB38 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for specified qualified expenditures at specified wineries and specified vineyards in the State; requiring the Maryland Department of Agriculture to administer the tax credit; providing for the maximum amount of tax credits that may be issued by the Department each year; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; applying the tax credit to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012; defining terms; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Tax Credit for Wineries and Vineyards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2012-09-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Alcoholic Beverages
Comptroller
Equipment
Income Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Agriculture, Department of
Alcoholic Beverages
Comptroller
Equipment
Income Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0038?ys=2013rs |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0038f.pdf |