MD SB375 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Physicians to place a licensee on emeritus status under certain circumstances; requiring the Board, under certain circumstances, to reinstate the license of an individual who is on inactive or emeritus status; exempting licensees who are on inactive status or emeritus status from continuing medical education requirements; repealing the requirement that the Board issue a license to an individual who is on inactive status under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians – Inactive and Emeritus Status
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {253322/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 14 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 320.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |