MD SB374 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for contributions made by specified individuals to specified college savings accounts subject to specified limitations; defining specified terms; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - College Savings Plans - Contributions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {279038/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |