MD SB374 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the local development council that would be formed if a video lottery facility is located in Baltimore City; and requiring that the local development council include one Delegate and one member of the Baltimore City Council who both represent areas where the communities surrounding the facility are located.
Title
Baltimore City - Video Lottery Facility - Local Development Council -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-05 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |