MD SB368 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period from 30 to 45 days within which an insurer, except under specified circumstances, must serve a specified notice on an employer and file a copy of the notice with a specified individual if the insurer is canceling or refusing to renew a workers' compensation insurance policy before its expiration; and providing for a delayed effective date.
Title
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Cancellation and Nonrenewal - Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {497473/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |