MD SB363 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, on or before July 1, 2023, to develop a program of education on the dangers of gambling and gambling addiction to be provided in public high schools; requiring the program to be coordinated with other State agencies responsible for gambling addiction education; authorizing a county board of education, beginning in the 2023-2024 school year, to require each public high school in the county to include instruction on the dangers of gambling one time for students in grades 9 through 12; etc.
Title
Public High Schools - Health Education - Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB243 (Carry Over) 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Gaming
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Gaming
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0363?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0363f.pdf |