MD SB363 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of State Board of Pharmacy regulations to prescribe and dispense specified contraceptives; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, on or before September 1, 2018, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians, the State Board of Nursing, and specified stakeholders to adopt regulations establishing the conditions under which pharmacists may prescribe and dispense contraceptives; etc.
Title
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-22) (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-22) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-15) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464531/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Birth Control
Drugs
Equipment
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Records
Reproductive Matters
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Youth
Drugs
Equipment
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Records
Reproductive Matters
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Youth