MD SB361 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Public-Private Partnership Oversight Review Board; requiring a certain reporting agency to include in presolicitation reports for public-private partnerships with a total value that exceeds $500,000,000 presolicitation reports of certain contracts and a certain environmental impact statement under certain circumstances; requiring certain agreements to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee; prohibiting the Board of Public Works, under certain circumstances, from designating a public-private partnership; etc.
Title
Public–Private Partnerships – Process and Oversight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB485 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
HB1424 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
HB1424 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Ethics
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privatization
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Time
Transportation
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Ethics
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privatization
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Time
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0361?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0361f.pdf |