MD HB1424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB485
Note: Carry Foward to future SB361
Note: Carry Foward to future SB361
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Public-Private Partnership Oversight Review Board; requiring a certain reporting agency to include in presolicitation reports for certain public-private partnerships presolicitation reports of certain contracts and a certain environmental impact statement under certain circumstances; requiring certain presolicitation reports to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee; prohibiting the Board of Public Works, under certain circumstances, from designating a public-private partnership; etc.
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
Sponsors
Del. Jared Solomon [D] | Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] |
Del. Jessica Feldmark [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] | Del. Sara Love [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 413228/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 413228/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-37) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {413228/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-93) |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {930614/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1424 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
HB1424 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
HB1424 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Construction
Contracts
Disclosure
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Examinations
General Assembly
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privatization
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Transportation
Treasurers
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Construction
Contracts
Disclosure
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Examinations
General Assembly
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privatization
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Transportation
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |