MD SB360 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Class MT (movie theater) beer and wine license in Anne Arundel County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to issue the license to the owner of a movie theater who holds a certain certification; authorizing a license holder to sell beer and wine to certain patrons at retail at the place described in the license for on-premises consumption; specifying that the license holder is subject to certain alcohol awareness requirements; providing an annual license fee of $1,200; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2020-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {614036/1 Adopted
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-24SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB651 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages111006.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages11102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback