MD HB651 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class MT (movie theater) beer, wine, and liquor license in Anne Arundel County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to issue the license to the owner of a movie theater; authorizing a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor to certain patrons at retail at the place described in the license for on-premises consumption; specifying the license holder is subject to certain alcohol awareness requirements; providing an annual fee of $1,200; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {863594/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB360 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Motion Pictures
Retail Sales
Theaters
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Motion Pictures
Retail Sales
Theaters
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 1006.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |