MD SB359 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Transportation to develop an urban tree program to replace trees removed during the construction of certain transportation projects; requiring the Department to consult with businesses, community representatives, local governments, and residents in developing the program; requiring the program to provide for the replacement of trees in areas affected by construction of a transportation facility project with priority given to those affected by environmental justice issues or the heat island effect; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-07SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (116-18)
2021-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {420811/1 Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-03-10HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-03-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {747770/1 Adopted
2021-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2021-01-15SenateHearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-15SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB80 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-01 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation2103.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback