MD SB353 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Confined Aquatic Disposal Task Force to study and review the overall concept, viability, and available options associated with confined aquatic disposal programs to meet the long-term dredged material placement needs of the State and the financial, economic, and environmental impacts of confined aquatic disposal; and requiring the Task Force to submit a report of its findings and recommendations on or before July 1, 2025, to a certain executive committee and certain committees of the General Assembly.
Title
Confined Aquatic Disposal Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {363223/1 Adopted |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Awareness and Outreach
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Dredging
Engineers
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fish and Fishing
General Assembly
Governor
Pollution
Ports
Salaries and Compensation
Sediment Control
Standards and Best Practices
Sunset
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Water Pollution
Zoning and Planning
Awareness and Outreach
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Dredging
Engineers
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fish and Fishing
General Assembly
Governor
Pollution
Ports
Salaries and Compensation
Sediment Control
Standards and Best Practices
Sunset
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Water Pollution
Zoning and Planning