MD SB35 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that teachers employed by the Maryland School for the Deaf are in the professional service in the State Personnel Management System.
Title
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment